CA AB1446 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 593, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 593, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2138.5, 2146, 2157, 2158, 2159.5, 2194, 2194.1, 18108.5, and 18109 of the Elections Code, and to amend Sections 6254.4 and 6276.46 of the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Voter registration: personal information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1446 Mullin By Padilla (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1446 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1446 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 593, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 4607.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 4704.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 9). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 18108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2138.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2159.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2194 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2194.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6254.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6276.46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |