CA AB1435 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26131 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Part 7.5 (commencing with Section 114500) to Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Part 14.6 (commencing with Section 34050) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to noncannabis cannabinoids, and making and appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Noncannabis cannabinoids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114500 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34050 | New Code | See Bill Text |