CA AB1431 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 85705 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Campaign contributions: school district and community college district administrators.
Sponsors
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Sen. Joel Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 1431 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1431 Gonzalez By Hueso (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1431 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1431 Gonzalez By Hueso (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1431 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6082.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 4418.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 5227.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 14). |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 29). |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 1). |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 5098 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 72030 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 72030.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85705 | New Code | See Bill Text |