CA AB1427 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19805, 19852.2, 19853, 19857, 19858, and 19859 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 336.5 of the Penal Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling Control Act: licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19857 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19858 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19859 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 336.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |