CA AB1423 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2604 to the Penal Code, relating to medical treatment of prisoners.
Title
Prisoners: medical treatment.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1423 Mark Stone By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1423 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1423 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2433.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1564.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2604 | New Code | See Bill Text |