CA AB1417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26038 and 26151 of, and to add Section 26151.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Cannabis advertisement and marketing.
Sponsors
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1417 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1417 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 1889.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1241.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26038 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26151.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |