CA AB1417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26038 and 26151 of, and to add Section 26151.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis advertisement and marketing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1417 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9).
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-06-24SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 1889.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23).
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-22AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1241.)
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 9).
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback