CA AB1415 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-29 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4976.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-29 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4976.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11340.5 of the Government Code, and to add Section 7109.5 to the Public Contract Code, relating to administrative regulations.
Title
Administrative regulations: corrosion prevention and mitigation projects.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] | Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D] | Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1415A& A.R. Assembly Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1415A& A.R. Assembly Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4976.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wright. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1602.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 20. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11340.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 7109.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |