CA AB1412 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 86203 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: gifts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Died on inactive file. | |
2009-08-17 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Krekorian. | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20). | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |