CA AB1408 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66473.7 of the Government Code, relating to subdivision map approvals.
Title
Subdivisions: Water Demand Mitigation Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1408 KREKORIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 32 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Died on inactive file. | |
2009-10-23 | (Corrected October 23.) | |
2009-06-03 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 2048.) To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Krekorian. | |
2009-06-02 | Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 34. Noes 32. Page 1995.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Krekorian. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-05-04 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-30 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P. & W. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |