CA AB1403 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7601, 7610, 7611, 7612, 7613, 7614, 7620, 7630, 7632, 7635, 7637, 7641, 7644, 7648.9, 7660, 7661, 7662, 7663, 7664, 7665, 7666, 7667, and 7669 of the Family Code, and to add Section 69617 to the Government Code, relating to family law.
Title
Family law.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1403 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1403 Committee on JUD. (Wieckowski) By Corbett (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1403 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1403 Committee on JUD. (Wieckowski) By Corbett (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1403 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 3125.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2251.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 1709.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 12. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |