CA AB1400 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 23 (commencing with Section 100600) to the Government Code, relating to health care coverage, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Guaranteed Health Care for All.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on third reading file. |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (January 20). |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100600 | New Code | See Bill Text |