CA AB1400 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 76038 to the Education Code, relating to community college districts.
Title
Community colleges: expulsion: hearing.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-03 - Assembly - AB 1400 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1400 Fong By Hancock (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1400 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1400 Fong By Hancock (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1400 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m. | |
2009-09-03 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2995.) | |
2009-09-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2071.) | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-07-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15). | |
2009-07-08 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-06-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1608.) | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1534.). | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |