CA AB1396 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2751 of, and to repeal Section 2752 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment contract requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Michael Allen [D] | Asm. Warren Furutani [D] | Asm. Sandre Swanson [D] |
Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1396 Committee on L. & E. (Swanson) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1396 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1396 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-29 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2076.). | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 1632.) | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1552.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-13 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2751 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2752 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |