CA AB1391 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4928 and 4934 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to acupuncture.
Title
Acupuncture Board.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1391 ENG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 3914.) | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-01-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (January 21). | |
2010-01-12 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (January 12). | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |