CA AB1383 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 14035 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District-based municipal elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1383 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By HERNANDEZ (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-29SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-05-28SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 2266.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-09-06SenateFrom inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-08-19SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
2013-07-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2013-06-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2013-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 20. Page 1471.)
2013-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 8).
2013-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2013-03-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
2013-03-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1383&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20130304_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20130906_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20130909_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_bill_20140528_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_vote_20130508_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_vote_20130516_1203PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1383_vote_20130626_000002_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback