CA AB1359 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66477 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Quimby Act: use of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1359 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1359 Roger Hern (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1359 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1359 Roger Hern (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1359 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 2788.). |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1987.). |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1809.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 1835.) |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1722.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66477 | Amended Code | Citation Text |