CA AB1359 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18914 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Public social services: CalFresh.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1359 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1359 Skinner By Liu (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 1359 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1359 Skinner By Liu (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 1359 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6531.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4900.). | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-07-02 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-03-20 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-01-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3607.) | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-01-19 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-10 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14523.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14528.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14539 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14549.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14551 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14560.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14573.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14575 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14575.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14585.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 19510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 19511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 19512 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18914 | Amended Code | Citation Text |