CA AB1358 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42008.7 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: misdemeanor violations: amnesty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 1358 FUENTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1358 Fuentes By Hancock (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1358 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1358 Fuentes By Hancock (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1358 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2924.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2203.). | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-06-27 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1555.) | |
2011-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 42008.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42008.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |