CA AB1348 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 510) to Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to the agricultural industry.
Title
Farmer Equity Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1348 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1348 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Galgiani (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1348 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1348 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Galgiani (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1348 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 3126.). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2530.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 1919.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 26). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 24741 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 510 | New Code | See Bill Text |