CA AB1346 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 22896 to the Government Code, relating to postemployment health benefits.
Title
Postemployment health benefits: Sacramento Metropolitan
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - AB 1346 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1346 Pan By Galgiani (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1346 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1346 Pan By Galgiani (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1346 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 2934.). |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2101.). |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 1516.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8). |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 22877 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22896 | New Code | See Bill Text |