CA AB1340 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5008 of, and to add Sections 5014, 5402.5, and 5899.3 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5008Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5014New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5402.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5899.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback