CA AB1337 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-13 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to add Section 42254.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste: plastic bag: recycling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-13AssemblyFrom committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2013-04-29AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
2013-04-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code42251Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42254.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback