CA AB1315 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and G.O.
Pending: Senate Military & Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and G.O.
Pending: Senate Military & Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1023.2 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans’ homes.
Title
Veterans’ homes: lease of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1315 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and G.O. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1410.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1023.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |