CA AB1304 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4433.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4433.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3000.02 to the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
California MAT Re-Entry Incentive Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1304 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1304 Waldron et al. By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1304 Waldron Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1304 Waldron et al. By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1304 Waldron Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4433.). | |
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5488.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to the unfinished business file. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-04-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1722.) |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3000.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |