CA AB1304 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 3000.02 to the Penal Code, relating to parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California MAT Re-Entry Incentive Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1304 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1304 Waldron et al. By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1304 Waldron Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
2020-08-31AssemblyOrdered to the unfinished business file.
2020-08-31AssemblyAction rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1.).
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-05-11SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-04-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-06-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1722.)
2019-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code3000.02New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback