CA AB1290 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Nguyen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 953 of, and to add Section 953.5 to, the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawyer-client privilege: holder of the privilege.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 1290 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-14SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Nguyen.
2017-08-31SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 18).
2017-06-27SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1271.)
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2017-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Evidence Code953Amended CodeCitation Text
Evidence Code953.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback