CA AB1282 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5026.5 to the Penal Code, relating to immigration enforcement.
Title
Immigration enforcement: private transportation.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1282 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1282 Kalra By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1282 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1282 Kalra By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1282 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 3145.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2583.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 1511.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 24). |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 5026.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |