CA AB1282 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 155.7 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Permitting Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1282 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1282 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1282 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2828.).
2017-07-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2129.).
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1968.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-29AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code155.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback