CA AB1282 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25600 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1282 HALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1282 Hall Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1282 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1282 Hall Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1282 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-10 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-02 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 2893.) | |
2009-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2014.) | |
2009-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |
2009-07-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 1552.) | |
2009-05-14 | From Consent Calendar. To third reading. | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |