CA AB1281 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49062.5 to the Education Code, relating to pupil data.
Title
Pupil data: California School Racial Equality
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1281 PORTANTINO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1281 Portantino By Alquist (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1281 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1281 Portantino By Alquist (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1281 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-10 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-02 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 2916.) | |
2009-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-31 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2019.) | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-14 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |
2009-06-30 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-27 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-26 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 1676.) | |
2009-05-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 13). | |
2009-05-04 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-30 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |