CA AB1259 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1473.7 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: motion to vacate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1259 Chiu et al. By Skinner (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1259 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1259 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2565.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 1543.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 12). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1473.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |