CA AB1254 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12025 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Production or cultivation of a controlled substance: civil penalties.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1254 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1254 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1721.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 12025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1847 | Amended Code | Citation Text |