CA AB1250 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 2721) to Part 2 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Water and sewer system corporations: consolidation of service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1250 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB1250 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1250 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB1250 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1250 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2849.). |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2392.). |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1692.) (June 28). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1787.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and U. & E. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2721 | New Code | See Bill Text |