CA AB1248 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 58595 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agricultural products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Institutional purchasers: purchase of California-grown agricultural products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1248 Eduardo Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2020-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-29SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-29SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-29SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1829.)
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code58595Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback