CA AB1242 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 629.51, 629.52, 638.50, 638.52, 1269b, 1524, 1524.2, and 1551 of, and to add Sections 1546.5 and 13778.2 to, the Penal Code, relating to reproductive rights, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Reproductive rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1242 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1242 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Skinner Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1242 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1242 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Skinner Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1242 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 15.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1723.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1269 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13778.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1524.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1546.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1551 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 629.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 629.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 638.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 638.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |