CA AB1234 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 448, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 448, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1215.8 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: registration statements.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1234 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1234 Levine By Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - AB 1234 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1234 Levine By Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - AB 1234 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 448, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6454.). |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6239.) |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4606.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3658.) |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 14). |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3499.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3499.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on INS.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. (Ayes 9. No |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10234.93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1215.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |