CA AB123 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1505, 1568.03, and 1569.145 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to community care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing for elderly or disabled persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 AB123 Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-16 - Assembly - AB 123 PORTANTINO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2009.
2009-08-05 Approved by the Governor.
2009-07-30 Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-06-29 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2009-06-29 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1519.)
2009-06-25 Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
2009-06-24 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-23 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-06-10 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
2009-04-30 Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2009-04-16 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-04-16 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 938.)
2009-04-02 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-04-01 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 1).
2009-03-25 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
2009-03-17 Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2009-03-16 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2009-02-26 Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2009-01-16 From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
2009-01-15 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_123&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20090115_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20090316_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20090702_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_bill_20090806_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20090324_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20090401_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20090416_0851AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20090609_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_123_vote_20090629_1252PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback