CA AB1228 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 54956.96 of the Government Code, relating to public agencies.
Title
Public agencies: joint power authorities: meetings.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Asm. Connie Conway [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] |
Asm. Linda Halderman [R] | Asm. David Valadao [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54956.96 | Amended Code | Citation Text |