CA AB1224 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 8.1 (commencing with Section 15010) to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.
Title
Workforce development: green jobs survey.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 15010 | New Code | See Bill Text |