CA AB1199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14670.37 to the Government Code, relating to state real property.
Title
State property: Fairview Developmental Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1199 Petrie-Norris By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1199 Petrie-Norris (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1199 Petrie-Norris (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2568.). |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1768.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and A. & A.R. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14670.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |