CA AB1189 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 24045.75 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control: special on-sale general license: for-profit theater.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and G.O. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24045.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |