CA AB1185 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 69434, 69435.3, and 69436 of, and to add and repeal Section 69431.9 of, the Education Code, relating to student financial aid, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student financial aid: Cal Grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1185 Cervantes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB1185 Cervantes et al. By Glazer Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1185 Cervantes Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-09-03SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69431.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code69434Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69435.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69436Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback