CA AB118 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1861 of the Fish and Game Code, to add Sections 14105.6, 14110.1, 14110.2, 14110.3, and 14110.4 to the Government Code, to amend Section 3073.5 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 10140 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Sections 800, 2038, 2192, and 2192.2 of, and to add Sections 800.5, 800.6, 800.7, 800.8, and 800.9 to, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 118 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-07-20SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2017-06-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 27).
2017-06-26SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1704.)
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-06-26SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-20SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-15SenateJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 1571.)
2017-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-06-14SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1602.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-15AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-05-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.)
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2017-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2017-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code1861Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code14105.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14110.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14110.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14110.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14110.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code3073.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code10140Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2038Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2192Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2192.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code800Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code800.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code800.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code800.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code800.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code800.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback