CA AB1173 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 116810 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Water equipment: backflow prevention devices testing: certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1173 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 1623.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 13). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |