CA AB1173 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19565, 23036, 23701, and 23701d of, and to add Section 17508.2 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal Income and Corporation Tax Law: nonqualified deferred compensation plan: tentative minimum tax: credits: exempt organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1173 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1173 Bocanegra By De Le (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1173 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1173 Bocanegra By De Le (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1173 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3352.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3354.). |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 2411.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2419.). |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1704.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17508.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19565 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |