CA AB1167 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 1 @ 3:00 pm Assembly Transportation Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 39719 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 75231 of, and to add Part 4.5 (commencing with Section 4960) to Division 4 of, the Public Resources, relating to greenhouse gases, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: high-speed rail: forestry and fire protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39719Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback