CA AB1153 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7312, 7316, 7320, 7324, and 7423 of, and to add Sections 7320.6 and 7324.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to barbering and cosmetology.
Title
Barbering and cosmetology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1153 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1153 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett. |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 23). |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 3686.) |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7320.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7320.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7324.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7364 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7364.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7396 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7423 | Amended Code | Citation Text |