CA AB1151 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 14.5 (commencing with Section 22260) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Tax agent registration.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 29). |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22260 | New Code | See Bill Text |