CA AB1144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 379.9 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Self-generation incentive program: community energy storage systems: high fire threat districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1144 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1144 Friedman et al. By Dahle (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - [08-30-2019] set for [Second] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1144 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1144 Friedman et al. By Dahle (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - [08-30-2019] set for [Second] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1144 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3423.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2758.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1358.) |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 379.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |